Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - State and Harford County Juke Box Licenses - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Cassilly, and Jennings
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to licenses for keeping juke boxes for public entertainment in the State and in Harford County.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0745
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 25
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 28
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1301 through 17-1318 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM