Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Governing Authority
Sponsored by
Senators King, Waugh, Currie, Ferguson, Madaleno, Serafini, and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the authority of the Board of Trustees of St. Mary's College of Maryland may not be superseded by any State agency or office in specified management affairs except by a provision of law that specifically references the College.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0561
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Governing Authority
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714437/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Governing Authority
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Appropriations 36
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Governing Authority
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-402, 14-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM