Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, DeGrange, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, Edwards, Robey, and Kittleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting specified indemnity mortgage transactions from the recordation tax; making indemnity mortgage transactions subject to recordation tax after a specified date; authorizing a specified calculation or allocation of recordation tax on indemnity mortgage transactions; altering the transaction amount that is subject to the recordation tax for supplemental instruments of writing; making specified refinancing instruments exempt from the recordation tax; altering the definition of "supplemental instrument of writing"; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589637/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {673824/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {589637/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {673824/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/03/2013 4/03/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-105, 12-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM