Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Hershey, Astle, Benson, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scope of provisions of law governing surplus lines insurance to authorize the use of surplus lines insurance for short-term medical insurance coverage; authorizing the procurement of short-term medical insurance from a nonadmitted insurer under specified circumstances; prohibiting the inclusion of specified provisions in a short-term policy procured from a nonadmitted insurer; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to develop and make available on the Web site a consumer guide on short-term medical insurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417378/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {417378/1 Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 43
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-301, 3-302, 3-306.2, 3-307, 3-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM