Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of a specified fee assessed by the Board of Nursing for the renewal of a nurse practitioner who holds an advanced practice certification; altering the number of hours, so that the required minimum of three rotations must each consist of at least 100 hours of community-based clinical training, that a specified nurse practitioner or licensed physician must work in a specified preceptorship program in order to qualify for a specified credit against the State income tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0683
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679636/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - Alterations
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {679636/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - Alterations
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-739 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM