Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to require a nonresident to pay a surcharge in addition to any license fees imposed under specified laws and regulations for specified recreational fishing and crabbing licenses; requiring the Department to establish the amount of the surcharge by regulation; requiring all surcharges collected under the Act to be credited to the Fisheries Research and Development Fund and used only for oyster restoration activities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Proceedings
29
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1 29
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky) 29
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1020.1, 4-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM