Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission - Review of Drug Transparency and Notification Laws and Initiatives
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Astle, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to review specified prescription drug transparency and notification laws and initiatives and information for purposes of assessing proposals for the adoption and implementation of laws or other initiatives in the State; authorizing the Commission, as part of its review, to consider specified studies and to receive input from experts on prescription drug pricing; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0666
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417674/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Expensive Drugs - Manufacturer Reporting and Drug Price Transparency Advisory Committee
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {417674/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission - Review of Drug Transparency and Notification Laws and Initiatives
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM