Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Bates, Benson, Eckardt, Kagan, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, Zucker, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Information Technology to appoint a specified access technology officer; requiring the access technology officer to develop a provision for inclusion in all State procurement contracts requiring a specified determination within 18 months of contract commencement; requiring the Department, by January 1, 2018, to adopt new nonvisual access procurement standards consistent with specified federal standards; providing a specified vendor may be subject to specified liquidated damages; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984934/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {984934/1 Adopted 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3A-301, 3A-303, 3A-303.1, 3A-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM