Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage - Application to Career and Technology Centers or STEM and STEAM Classrooms
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the provisions of the prevailing wage law do not apply to a public work contract or part of a public work contract for the construction or renovation of a career and technology center or for school classroom space to be used for science, technology, engineering, mathematics (STEM) or science, technology, engineering, art, mathematics (STEAM) education.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1459
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM