Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Annual Report - Grants
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a specified annual report made by the Maryland Energy Administration to the Governor and General Assembly include a detailed accounting of all amounts received by and disbursed from the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, including the amount and recipient of each grant awarded by the Administration.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-20B-12 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM