Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that two is the maximum number of Class DBR licenses that may be issued by the Harford County Board of License Commissioners to the same person; permitting the holder of a Class DBR license in Harford County to sell beer brewed at the brewery to the extent the license holder is allowed under the license holder's Class 5 brewery license; and establishing an annual license fee of $500.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limit on Class DBR Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limit on Class DBR Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733695/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limit on Class DBR Licenses
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limit on Class DBR Licenses
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {733695/1 Adopted 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text - Chapter - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM