Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Minority Business Enterprise Program
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Griffith, Hester, Lam, Patterson, Smith, Sydnor, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing, under certain circumstances, that the provisions of the Minority Business Enterprise Program apply to public-private partnerships; prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving a public-private partnership agreement until the reporting agency, in consultation with certain entities, establishes certain minority business enterprise goals and procedures; requiring that certain goals and procedures be based on the requirements of certain provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Minority Business Enterprise Program
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:18 PM