Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a contract awarded or renewed between a specified agency and a provider of a residential child care program to require the provider to enter into a memorandum of understanding with a specified community organization and post the memorandum of understanding in a specified location; specifying the contents of a memorandum of understanding; requiring a memorandum of understanding to be in writing and signed by specified representatives; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 16
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-701, 8-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM