Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Guzzone, Lee, Madaleno, and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim April 16 as National Healthcare Decisions Day.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0091
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-4)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-13)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-4) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (127-13) 71
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-405, 7-405 through 7-416 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM