Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Benson, Ellis, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Pinsky, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding to all counties in the State a prohibition on State agencies constructing within the nine Eastern Shore counties a toll road, toll highway, or toll bridge without the consent of a majority of the affected counties; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Reassigned to Finance 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page