Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly creating, building, or installing a specified hidden compartment in a motor vehicle; prohibiting a person from knowingly owning or operating a motor vehicle that contains a specified hidden compartment; authorizing the seizure of specified motor vehicles involved in a violation of the Act; requiring the forfeiture of specified motor vehicles seized under the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0028
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-419, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM