Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating in Harford County a permit to be issued by the Sheriff of Harford County that authorizes specified nonprofit organizations to conduct a gaming contest in Harford County; specifying requirements that organizations must meet to be issued a permit; authorizing a permit holder under the Act to charge only a preset entrance fee; requiring participants in a gaming contest to use tokens and not cash for wagering; requiring an individual who participates in a gaming contest to be at least 21 years of age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0195 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925364/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 40
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {925364/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1512 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM