Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Stone, Brochin, Forehand, Jacobs, and Raskin
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum penalty for being an accessory after the fact to murder in the first degree from 5 years to 10 years; increasing the maximum penalty for being an accessory after the fact to murder in the second degree from 5 years to 10 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868279/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {868279/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM