Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Madaleno, McFadden, Robinson, Rosapepe, Young, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City; requiring, to the extent practicable, the Task Force to reflect a certain diversity; requiring the Task Force to identify and examine certain negative social factors and develop and implement solutions to improve the circumstances in which residents of Baltimore City live, work, play, and worship; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1 of each year; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {267675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {156384/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {267675/1 Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Text - Third - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31) 31
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 31
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 32
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {156384/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Text - Chapter - Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3601 through 13-3608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM