Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Conway, Forehand, Frosh, Madaleno, Montgomery, Pugh, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a person who has been issued a permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun may only wear, carry, or transport the handgun within the scope of the permit issued; altering a specified list of criteria that the Secretary of State Police must use to determine whether a specified handgun permit shall be issued to a person to include findings by the Secretary that the person is not prohibited from possessing a regulated firearm and additional specified conditions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203 )
(   5-133, 5-306, 5-309, 5-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM