Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Penny-Ante Games
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to conduct a specified penny-ante game in which the winnings of any player in a single round, hand, or game do not exceed $20 under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/02/2016 Text - First - Gaming - Penny-Ante Games
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM