Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education and Private Career Schools - Instructional Spending - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Elfreth, Ellis, Kagan, Lam, Sydnor, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain for-profit institutions of higher education and private career schools to report certain information on revenues and spending to the Maryland Higher Education Commission on or before June 30 each year; requiring that, on or after July 1, 2022, and each July 1 thereafter, in order to maintain approval to operate in the State and enroll certain students, the institutions and schools must submit a certain plan and provide certain refunds under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education and Private Career Schools - Instructional Spending - Requirements
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-210 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:19 PM