Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Kelley, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Enacting, with specified other member states, the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact to strengthen access to health care by providing a streamlined process allowing physicians to become licensed in multiple states; establishing specified eligibility requirements for physicians; requiring physicians to designate a specified state as the state of principal license; establishing the Interstate Commission to administer the Compact; requiring the Commission to establish a database of specified physicians and applicants; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0252 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM