Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Cassilly, Jennings, Norman, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a sales and use tax exemption period for the 7-day period from the third Sunday in April through the following Saturday for hunting and sporting goods shopping in Maryland during which the sales and use tax does not apply to the sale of firearms, fishing supplies, and hunting supplies if the taxable price of the item is less than $1,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0958
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM