Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a cheese and deli shop wine privilege in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the privilege for use by an establishment for which a Class A beer and wine license has been issued that derives at least 50% of its total average daily receipts from the sale of cheese, meats, sandwiches, and other products normally associated with delis; authorizing the holder of the privilege to sell wine by the glass for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; specifying a privilege fee of $100; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0762
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834439/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine License - Cheese and Deli Shops
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {834439/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Economic Matters 44
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text - Chapter - Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-102, 20-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM