Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Cease and Desist Orders and Penalties for Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to issue cease and desist orders or obtain injunctive relief for violations of specified provisions of law; altering a specified penalty; providing that a person who violates specified provisions of law is subject to a civil fine not exceeding $50,000 to be assessed by the Board in accordance with specified regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0112
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554232/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {554232/1 Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-301, 17-513, 17-601 through 17-603, 17-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM