Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a specified disposition hearing; requiring the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a permanency planning hearing or guardianship hearing; providing that, if the juvenile court enters an order directing the provision of specified services to a specified child, the juvenile court shall retain jurisdiction over the child for a specified period of time and for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0683
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {778677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {732818/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senators Zirkin, Muse, and Hough
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {778677/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {732818/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senators Zirkin, Muse, and Hough 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-804, 3-819, 3-823 )
(   5-324, 5-328 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM