Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Mathias, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the effective dates of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414432/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {136682/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {414432/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {136682/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM