Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Augustine, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, Miller, Peters, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to appear at a precinct polling place in the individual's county of residence and apply to register to vote; requiring an applicant for a voter registration on election day to provide proof of residency; specifying the acceptable forms of proof of residency; requiring an election judge to determine whether an applicant for voter registration resides in the precinct and is qualified to become a registered voter; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Election Day Voter Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984134/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984134/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625360/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {363923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-96)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Election Day Voter Registration
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {984134/1 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {984134/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 45A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Ways and Means 46
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {625360/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Floor Amendment {363923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-96) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Text - Chapter - Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-302, 3-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM