Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for Submission
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to permit an insured, a subscriber, or a member to submit a claim for reimbursement for specified expenses by first-class mail and by facsimile transmission or through a Web site; requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations annually to provide a specified notice and instructions on how to submit a claim by facsimile transmission or through a secure Web site; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0660
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {607374/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM