Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the vessel excise tax for the purchase of a vessel by a commercial enterprise if the use of the vessel will require the payment of at least 50% of the value of the exemption in admissions and amusement tax; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31 each year; providing that the Act applies to vessels purchased after June 30, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM