Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income and Task Force to Study Senior Emigration
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Feldman, Forehand, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, King, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum amount allowed as a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified retirement income of an individual who is at least 70 years old or who is totally disabled; establishing a task force to study specified effects of State and local tax policies on senior emigration; applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0868
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0048 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM