Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain references to vehicles and certain automobiles in certain provisions of the Insurance Article for the purpose of consistency.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Economic Matters 39
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text - Chapter - Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-128, 10-602, 10-603, 10-604, 10-606, 10-701, 10-702, 25-401, 27-609, 27-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM