Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Retirement - Eligibility and Allowance
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility for a service retirement for certain members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; and prohibiting a certain retirement allowance from being reduced by the actuarial equivalent of any missed accumulated contributions attributable to certain service transferred into the Correctional Officers' Retirement System.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Retirement - Eligibility and Allowance
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-312, 25-201, 25-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM