Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Abortion Survey System
Sponsored by
Senators Reilly, Glassman, and Jacobs
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a mandatory abortion survey system; requiring specified hospitals and facilities to report abortions to the Department using a specified form, in a specified manner, and on or before January 15 of each year; providing that a report received by the Department under the Act is confidential, not a public record, may not include specified information, and shall be destroyed after specified data is used to prepare a specified report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0898
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM