Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to certify annually the amount of assessable base for real property located in a specified development district; applying the Act to the calculation of payment of State aid to counties and Baltimore City for fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2017; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that specified recommendations regarding education funding shall consider the impact of economic development incentives in low wealth jurisdictions on State education aid; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {899436/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {899436/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM