Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Definition of Premium - Inclusion of Motor Vehicle Driving Record Report and Accident History Report Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "premium" for purposes of the insurance laws of the State to include a driving record report fee and an accident history report fee.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777673/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {777673/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 38
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM