Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Assessment Appeal Board - Member - Salary
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and King
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that a member of a property tax assessment appeal board is entitled to compensation at an hourly rate equal to $40 per hour; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of specified members of a property tax assessment appeal board while serving in a specified term of office; and providing that this limitation does not apply to an individual appointed after the effective date of the Act to fill out an unexpired term.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM