Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Hester, Augustine, Beidle, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Kagan, Lam, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 236
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to create a Resilience Authority by local law; specifying certain requirements for the adoption of a local law establishing an Authority; specifying the powers that a local government may grant an Authority; authorizing an Authority to issue certain bonds for certain purposes; authorizing the local governing body to dedicate certain revenues of the local government to the repayment of bonds and to support operations or resilience infrastructure projects of an Authority; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {940312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-20)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 236
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {654136/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 42A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {940312/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (111-20) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 236
Text - Chapter - Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101 through 22-113 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM