Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the 40th Alcoholic Beverages District of Baltimore City to the locations in which a holder of a specified Class D alcoholic beverages license may be issued a Class 7 micro-brewery license; authorizing the holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license in Baltimore City to brew at two locations using the same license and to obtain a Class 2 rectifying license for specified premises at specified locations, under specified circumstances; requiring the holder of a Class 7 license to submit an application to the State Comptroller; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0953
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734731/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693090/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {734731/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {693090/1 Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 60
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM