Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity from Liability
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the duties of a director of a corporation and that the director must act in good faith, in a manner the director reasonably believes to be in the best interests of the corporation, and with the care that an ordinarily prudent person in a similar position would use under similar circumstances; clarifying that a director who acts in accordance with a specified provision of law shall have specified immunity from liability; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-401, 2-405.1, 8-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM