Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified campaign finance law definitions to include campaign finance activity relating to prospective questions to be placed on the ballot; prohibiting a chief election official from certifying a petition if the petition sponsor fails to provide proof of filing a specified campaign finance report; repealing specified requirements that a statement of contributions and expenditures for a petition be filed at the time the petition is filed; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0963
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994939/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994939/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (President) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-43)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {994939/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {994939/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Special Order until later today (President) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 46
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (91-43) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-202, 13-309, 6-208, 7-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM