Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program to include providing technical assistance to assist small businesses with attracting and accessing private capital.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland Small Business Innovation Research Technical Assistance Program – Alterations
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/3/2021 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page