Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local Anesthesia
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a dental hygienist may administer local anesthesia by infiltration or inferior nerve block.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 32
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-206.1, 4-206.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM