Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman – Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Beidle, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, King, Lee, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Sydnor, Washington, West, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman to have the ability to analyze environmental and natural resource-related data and communicate effectively with State agencies and the public; providing for the appointment, qualifications, and salary of the Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman to receive and process complaints involving suspected environmental and natural resources violations in a certain manner; requiring the development and maintenance of a certain website; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0614
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784132/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784132/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {933927/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833327/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-10)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Office of the Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman - Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act)
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {784132/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {784132/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {933927/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {833327/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government – Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman – Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act)
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (35-10) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   6-501 through 6-504 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page