Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Ferguson, Guzzone, Manno, Middleton, Pinsky, Smith, Waugh, Young, Conway, Bates, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law in Allegany, Carroll, Charles, Harford, Kent, Montgomery, Queen Anne's, and Washington counties that prohibit a license holder or an employee from knowingly selling or providing an alcoholic beverage to an individual with an intellectual disability or to an individual if a family member or guardian has given written notice to the license holder or employee under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0287
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {204630/1 Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Economic Matters 39
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text - Chapter - Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-102, 16-2704, 18-102, 18-2704, 22-102, 22-2705, 24-102, 24-2704, 25-102, 25-2705, 27-102, 27-2704, 31-102, 31-2704, 9-102, 9-2704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM