Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Wetlands and Waterways Authorizations - Installation of Personal Watercraft Lifts
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to install a maximum of six personal watercraft lifts or hoists per pier, a maximum of four boat lifts or hoists per pier, or a combination of a maximum of six boat or personal watercraft lifts or hoists per pier of which not more than four lifts or hoists are boat lifts or hoists, under a minor wetlands and waterways project authorization from the Department of the Environment; and establishing a $300 application fee for an authorization to install the lifts or hoists.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454436/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {454436/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 40
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM