Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum penalty for driving on a highway without a license; altering the maximum penalty for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended under certain provisions of State law relating to nonpayment of child support, noncompliance with an order to attend a certain driver improvement program, lapse of required security, noncompliance with traffic citations, and nonpayment of fines; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0347 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   16-101, 16-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page