Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the requirements for specified apprentice sponsors and a specified process for seeking approval by the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors for an apprentice license; requiring specified evidence and death certificates to be submitted to the Board as proof of the completion of specified apprentice requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {854734/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 52
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-306, 7-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM