Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Developmental Education Courses - Student Credit Hours
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the defined term of "student credit hours" as used in the calculation of State aid for community colleges and Baltimore City Community College; defining "developmental education course"; and declaring that it is the intent of the General Assembly that any reduction of State aid to the community colleges that results from the Act may not be recouped by the community colleges through an increase in tuition or fees charged for developmental education courses.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 16
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-305, 16-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM